Ex-faculty
Name of Teacher | Period of Service |
Dileshwar Tanti | 05-07-1970 to 1971 |
Benudhar Duarah | 02-09-1971 to NA |
Bimala Prasad Phukan | 01-12-1971 to 1999 |
Jibendra Kr. Saikia | 05-11-1973 to 1990 |
Apurba Prasad Saikia | 23-06-1984 to 1986 |
Arpon Kr Baruah | 05-08-1978 to 30-09-2016 |
Dilip Ranjan Baruah | 16-11-1989 to 31-07-2022 |
Mintoo Gogoi | 13-08-1992 to Present |
Paranan Konwar | 14-08-2000 to Present |
Mridusmita Patowary | 01-12-2021 to Present |